U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cv-05119
  • Case Name: Vice v. Becker et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Filing Fee Received]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [Filing Fee Received]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Filing Fee Received]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Filing Fee Received]
December, 2017
  • December 08, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
May, 2017
  • May 12, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 02, 2017: [Reconsideration]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 24, 2017: [Order]
  • February 01, 2017: [Receipt of Initial Partial Filing Fee]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 20, 2017: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • January 06, 2017: [Letter Sent]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Letter Sent]
  • December 27, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • December 27, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 27, 2016: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • December 27, 2016: [Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.