U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-40535
  • Case Name: Nancy Lee Conzemius
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Closing Case]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Trustee's Report of Small Dividends/Unclaimed Funds]
  • June 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
  • June 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service of TFR (Used only by Ch 7 Trustee)]
  • June 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation (Without Notice)]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 29, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • March 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • March 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney]
February, 2017
  • February 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • February 15, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • January 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 29, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service of Tax Information to Requestor]
  • December 29, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (deactivated)]
  • December 28, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • December 28, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Add Trustee]
  • December 28, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employee Income Records]
  • December 28, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 28, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 28, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 28, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.