U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-04177
  • Case Name: Parham v. Nwadibia
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Certificate]
  • January 30, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 25, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 25, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 25, 2017: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • January 25, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • January 25, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 09, 2017: [Received]
  • January 06, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 04, 2017: [Summons Issued]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Letter Sent]
  • December 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 28, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 28, 2016: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 28, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.