U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-04163
  • Case Name: Foxhoven v. Goeman-Johnson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Hearing]
May, 2017
  • May 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 11, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 05, 2017: [Reply]
  • May 04, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 01, 2017: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 28, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • April 28, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • April 25, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Received]
  • March 24, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 24, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • March 24, 2017: [Brief]
  • March 24, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 16, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 08, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 08, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • February 06, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 06, 2017: [Dismiss]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Certificate]
  • January 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 19, 2017: [Discovery Report]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 29, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.