U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-04179
  • Case Name: Clayton v. Sioux Steel Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Judgment]
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • May 17, 2018: [Reply]
  • May 06, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 06, 2018: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • May 06, 2018: [Response to Motion]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 16, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 16, 2018: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • April 16, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • October 03, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 07, 2017: [Discovery Report]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • February 08, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 08, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Acknowledgment of Service]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • December 29, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • December 29, 2016: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 29, 2016: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.