U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-01057
  • Case Name: El Karmassi v. GCR Firestone
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • February 22, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 22, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 09, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • January 26, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • January 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Letter Sent]
  • December 29, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 29, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 29, 2016: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 29, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.