U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-04180
  • Case Name: Meierhenry Sargent LLP v. Williams et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 08, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • June 08, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal (attorney use)]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Text Order]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Order Lifting Stay]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 21, 2021: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 15, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 14, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • March 24, 2021: [USCA Opinion]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Order Reassigning Case]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Letter Sent]
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • December 05, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • December 05, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • December 03, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 03, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 20, 2019: [Transcript]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 31, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • October 28, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • October 25, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 24, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 23, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 21, 2019: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 01, 2019: [Notice]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order]
  • September 27, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 27, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 25, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • September 20, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • September 12, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • September 09, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 03, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • August 30, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 30, 2019: [Stay]
  • August 30, 2019: [Disqualify]
  • August 29, 2019: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 29, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 08, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • August 08, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 08, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • May 22, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 22, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Brief]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order]
  • April 08, 2019: [Response]
  • April 01, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • February 19, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • February 15, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • February 06, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • February 06, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 29, 2019: [Stay]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Letter Sent]
  • January 30, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • January 30, 2018: [Transcript]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • December 19, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 19, 2017: [Court Reporter Information]
  • December 18, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 18, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 23, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 27, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • September 14, 2017: [Declaration]
  • September 14, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 13, 2017: [Declaration]
  • September 13, 2017: [Response to Motion]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • August 23, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 23, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 23, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2017
  • May 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
February, 2017
  • February 09, 2017: [Declaration]
  • February 09, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 26, 2017: [Brief]
  • January 13, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
  • January 06, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 06, 2017: [Stay]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 03, 2017: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 30, 2016: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 30, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
  • December 30, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.