U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-10175
  • Case Name: Crystal Kay Steiner
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 05, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
April, 2017
  • April 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 04, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
February, 2017
  • February 20, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • February 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement (not to be used by attorney not admitted to this federal bar)]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • January 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • January 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • January 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • December 30, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • December 30, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • December 30, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 30, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 30, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 30, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 30, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • December 30, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.