U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cv-05120
  • Case Name: Bissonette v. Dooley et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • July 11, 2018: [USCA Order]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • December 22, 2017: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • December 22, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • December 14, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 14, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Set Aside Judgment]
  • November 13, 2017: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 09, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Mandamus (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Letter Received]
  • September 28, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 28, 2017: [Notice]
  • September 28, 2017: [Set Aside Judgment]
  • September 11, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 11, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • September 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 11, 2017: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • March 13, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
  • February 16, 2017: [Notice]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Received]
  • January 24, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 24, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • January 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 23, 2017: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • January 23, 2017: [Brief]
  • January 23, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 03, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Letter Sent]
  • December 30, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • December 30, 2016: [Brief]
  • December 30, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.