U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cv-05121
  • Case Name: Walker v. Shafer et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • November 16, 2022: [USCA Order]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • October 04, 2022: [USCA Opinion]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [USCA Order]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • March 21, 2022: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 07, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 29, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Response to Motion]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Response]
  • October 13, 2020: [Compel]
  • October 13, 2020: [Objection]
  • October 13, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • October 13, 2020: [Response to Motion]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 30, 2020: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • September 30, 2020: [Sanctions]
  • September 30, 2020: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 30, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 09, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • July 23, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • July 17, 2020: [Order]
  • July 07, 2020: [Request]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 22, 2020: [Notice]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • June 05, 2020: [Reconsideration]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • May 21, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 05, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • May 05, 2020: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • May 05, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • April 14, 2020: [Change Venue]
  • April 14, 2020: [Recusal]
  • April 03, 2020: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 03, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 03, 2020: [Sanctions]
  • April 03, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • April 01, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Objection to Magistrate Judge Order]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 15, 2019: [Request]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Hearing]
  • October 25, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 25, 2019: [Strike]
  • October 21, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • October 21, 2019: [Response]
  • October 07, 2019: [Objection]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 25, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • August 07, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Reply]
  • April 23, 2019: [Response]
  • April 09, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • April 09, 2019: [Objection to Magistrate Judge Order]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Miscellaneous Submission (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 11, 2018: [In Limine]
  • December 11, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 11, 2018: [Bill of Costs]
  • December 11, 2018: [Response to Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • November 14, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 14, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 07, 2018: [Response]
  • November 07, 2018: [Motions Referred]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • October 31, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 31, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 31, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 11, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 09, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 05, 2018: [Response]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Brief]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • August 15, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 03, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 15, 2018: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 08, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 08, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
  • May 07, 2018: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 07, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 02, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 02, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • May 02, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • May 01, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 17, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2018: [Compel]
  • April 13, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • April 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 06, 2018: [Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 31, 2018: [Discovery Report]
  • March 23, 2018: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • February 23, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 22, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • February 22, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • February 22, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 09, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 02, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Reply]
  • October 30, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 30, 2017: [Brief]
  • October 26, 2017: [Reply]
  • October 19, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • October 16, 2017: [Brief]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order to Show Cause]
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Declaration]
  • August 02, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 02, 2017: [Dismiss]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 24, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 12, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • July 11, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • June 20, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 20, 2017: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • June 19, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 19, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 16, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • June 14, 2017: [Summons Reissued]
  • June 12, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • June 08, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • June 01, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 01, 2017: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • June 01, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 01, 2017: [Summons Issued]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 17, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • May 17, 2017: [Summons Issued]
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Letter Sent]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • January 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 03, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Letter Sent]
  • December 30, 2016: [Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 30, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • December 30, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.