U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:11-cr-50016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Black Smith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • September 07, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 25, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 17, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 20, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 18, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 18, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 18, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 18, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 18, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 22, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 12, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 12, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 12, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 01, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 25, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 25, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 25, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 25, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 24, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 24, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 27, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.