U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-04181
  • Case Name: Parham v. Schock et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 01, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • February 03, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order]
  • February 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 13, 2017: [Letter Received]
  • January 05, 2017: [Miscellaneous Submission (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Letter Sent]
  • December 30, 2016: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 30, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • December 30, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.