U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-10176
  • Case Name: Corey William Carlson and Dorothy Glendale Carlson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amendment to Petition with Notice]
  • February 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • February 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 05, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Late Notice]
  • February 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Fee Due (Create Outstanding Fee)]
  • February 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • January 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • January 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • January 11, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • January 11, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • January 11, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • January 05, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • January 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • January 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deficiency Deadline(s)]
  • January 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • January 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • January 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 02, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (deactivated)]
December, 2016
  • December 31, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.