U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cv-05001
  • Case Name: Walker v. Varcoe et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • December 04, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 28, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • November 22, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 22, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 22, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • November 14, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • November 06, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 06, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • January 03, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 03, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 03, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • January 03, 2017: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.