U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cv-03001
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Johnson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 19, 2018: [Dismiss]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 08, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Brief]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 29, 2017: [Brief]
  • September 29, 2017: [Response]
  • September 29, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • September 08, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • September 08, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 08, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • September 08, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Discovery Report]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • January 24, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 12, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 03, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • January 03, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
  • January 03, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • January 03, 2017: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.