U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-04001
  • Case Name: Pierce v. Carlson General Carpentry, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Receipt of Filing Fee]
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 09, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Request for Certified Copy]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Close Adversary Case]
  • March 01, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Judgment]
  • February 27, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Default Judgment]
  • February 27, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Return of Service ]
  • February 08, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 06, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Clerk's Entry of Default]
January, 2017
  • January 04, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Summons Service Executed]
  • January 04, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Summons Issued]
  • January 04, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Fees - Deferred]
  • January 04, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.