U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cr-10059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bobtail Bear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 02, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 02, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 28, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 28, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 28, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 24, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 24, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 23, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 23, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 23, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 04, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 04, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 28, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 23, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 18, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 18, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 18, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 18, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 16, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 11, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
May, 2017
  • May 05, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 04, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 04, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 09, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 09, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 20, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 18, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 09, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 09, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 09, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • January 09, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • January 09, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 09, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 09, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 09, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 06, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 06, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 04, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 04, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.