U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cv-05122
  • Case Name: Jahner v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 11, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 04, 2017: [Extend]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [Dismiss]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 07, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 02, 2017: [Response to Motion to Vacate (28:2255)]
January, 2017
  • January 05, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order]
  • January 04, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 04, 2017: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (28:2255) (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.