U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-04146
  • Case Name: Viera v. Young et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
July, 2017
  • July 10, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Motions Referred]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Joinder]
  • January 06, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 04, 2017: [Summons Reissued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.