U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50168-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2019
  • January 08, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 08, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 07, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • January 02, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 28, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 28, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 04, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 24, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 24, 2018: [Consent]
  • August 24, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 21, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 21, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 21, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 21, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 21, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 20, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • August 15, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 06, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 02, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 02, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • August 02, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2018
  • March 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 09, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • December 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 21, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 21, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 20, 2017: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • December 20, 2017: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • December 19, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • December 19, 2017: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • December 19, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • December 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 14, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • December 14, 2017: [Response]
  • December 13, 2017: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 21, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 21, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 21, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 03, 2017: [Notice]
  • November 03, 2017: [In Limine]
  • November 03, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 03, 2017: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
October, 2017
  • October 06, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 05, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 25, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 19, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • September 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 14, 2017: [Furlough]
  • September 07, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 30, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 18, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 23, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 23, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 22, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • June 21, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 06, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 25, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 08, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 20, 2017: [Furlough]
  • January 06, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 06, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 06, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 06, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • January 06, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 05, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • January 05, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 05, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 04, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 04, 2017: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.