U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50004
  • Case Name: Daniel Ray Spain and Ashley Nicole Spain
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
April, 2017
  • April 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
  • April 04, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • February 03, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • February 03, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
January, 2017
  • January 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • January 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • January 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • January 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • January 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.