U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-04002
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Nelson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • August 19, 2022: [Vacate]
  • August 19, 2022: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order]
  • June 13, 2022: [Response]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Proposed Order]
  • April 15, 2020: [Supplement]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Letter Received]
  • March 26, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 26, 2020: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Reply]
  • September 20, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • September 13, 2019: [Reply]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Brief]
  • August 30, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order]
  • August 05, 2019: [Request]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order]
  • August 01, 2019: [Request]
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 01, 2019: [Declaration]
  • July 01, 2019: [Extend]
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 03, 2019: [Response to Motion]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Extend]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order]
  • April 29, 2019: [Extension of Time re Transcript]
  • April 25, 2019: [Letter Received]
  • April 08, 2019: [Brief]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Miscellaneous Submission (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 18, 2019: [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • November 15, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: [Letter Received]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Brief]
  • July 17, 2018: [Letter Received]
  • July 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • June 14, 2018: [Miscellaneous Submission (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 11, 2018: [Letter Received]
  • June 05, 2018: [Response]
  • June 01, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 01, 2018: [Reconsideration]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • May 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • May 22, 2018: [Miscellaneous Submission (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 17, 2018: [Letter Received]
  • May 14, 2018: [Brief]
  • May 10, 2018: [Order]
  • May 08, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • May 08, 2018: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • May 07, 2018: [Letter Received]
  • May 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2018: [Response]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Miscellaneous Submission (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 02, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 02, 2018: [Default Judgment]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Letter Received]
  • October 10, 2017: [Response]
  • October 06, 2017: [Miscellaneous Submission (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 05, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 05, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Response]
  • September 25, 2017: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • September 19, 2017: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • September 19, 2017: [Entry of Default]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Response]
  • August 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • March 07, 2017: [Response to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 17, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 14, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • February 02, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 09, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • January 09, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 09, 2017: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 09, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.