U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-01001
  • Case Name: Nelson v. Dooley et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 03, 2017: [Objection]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Judgment of Dismissal (Clerk)]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 03, 2017: [Declaration]
  • February 03, 2017: [Objection]
  • February 03, 2017: [Notice]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 20, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 17, 2017: [Supplement]
  • January 09, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • January 09, 2017: [Bond]
  • January 09, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 09, 2017: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • January 09, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 09, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.