U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tripp
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 08, 2024: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 12, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 09, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • February 09, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 02, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 02, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 02, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 01, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 01, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
November, 2017
  • November 24, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 17, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 11, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 11, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 11, 2017: [Waiver]
  • August 01, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 31, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 31, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 31, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 03, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 01, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 01, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 20, 2017: [Extend]
  • March 17, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 20, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 11, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • January 10, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • January 10, 2017: [Text Order]
  • January 10, 2017: [Indictment]
  • January 10, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 10, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • January 09, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.