U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Drapeau
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 03, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 03, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 22, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 22, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 22, 2018: [Order]
  • February 22, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 22, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 16, 2018: [Continue]
  • February 15, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • February 15, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 08, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 08, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 07, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 07, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 07, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • February 07, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 06, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 10, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 09, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 09, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 01, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 01, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 03, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 07, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 01, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 31, 2017: [Discovery]
  • January 24, 2017: [Response]
  • January 24, 2017: [Request]
  • January 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 20, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • January 19, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 19, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 19, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • January 19, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 19, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • January 18, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 18, 2017: [Arrest]
  • January 18, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 10, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 10, 2017: [Indictment]
  • January 10, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.