U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cabrera
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 21, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 21, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 21, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 27, 2017: [Notice]
  • February 27, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 13, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 13, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 13, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 06, 2017: [Discovery]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 13, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • January 13, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 13, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • January 13, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 11, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • January 10, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 10, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.