U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cordon-Cordon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 28, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 28, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 26, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 21, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 21, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 21, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 08, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 24, 2017: [Consent]
  • March 24, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 24, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 03, 2017: [Status Conference]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 13, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 13, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 13, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 13, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 11, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • January 10, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • January 10, 2017: [Text Order]
  • January 10, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 10, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.