U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-10001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perko
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • September 15, 2022: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • September 13, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 12, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 12, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 12, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 09, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • August 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 18, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 15, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 05, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 08, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 08, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 07, 2022: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 18, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 18, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • May 18, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 18, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • May 12, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 11, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • May 11, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 02, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2018
  • May 08, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • May 08, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • May 08, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • May 03, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • May 03, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • May 03, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 13, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 12, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 11, 2017: [Memorandum Letter]
  • October 02, 2017: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 08, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 08, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 08, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 10, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 06, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 25, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 25, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 25, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 06, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 01, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 01, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Order]
  • February 16, 2017: [Stipulation]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 25, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • January 25, 2017: [Request]
  • January 23, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 23, 2017: [Arrest]
  • January 20, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 20, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • January 20, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • January 19, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 19, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 19, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 19, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 18, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • January 10, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 10, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 10, 2017: [Indictment]
  • January 10, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.