U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10004
  • Case Name: Timothy Leslie Nisich and Amy Joelle Nisich
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismissing Case (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • October 04, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reminder for Filing Application for Fees]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • August 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • July 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • July 05, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Order Request]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • June 08, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • June 02, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 02, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice]
  • June 02, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • June 02, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
May, 2017
  • May 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 10, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Order]
  • May 10, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • April 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
  • March 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 23, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 23, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • March 22, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • March 22, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • March 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • February 23, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • February 20, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • February 08, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • February 08, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • February 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • February 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • January 19, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • January 18, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • January 18, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • January 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 11, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (deactivated)]
  • January 10, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • January 10, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • January 10, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • January 10, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • January 10, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 10, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 10, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.