U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cv-05123
  • Case Name: Two Bears Witko v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [USCA Order]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [USCA Judgment]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • June 28, 2017: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • June 28, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • June 23, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 23, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • June 05, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 11, 2017: [Mail Returned]
February, 2017
  • February 09, 2017: [Letter Received]
January, 2017
  • January 11, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • January 11, 2017: [Miscellaneous Submission (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 11, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 11, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • January 11, 2017: [Supplement]
  • January 11, 2017: [Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.