U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50006
  • Case Name: Jon Fredrick Hein and Dee Ann LeBeau-Hein
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
August, 2017
  • August 03, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • May 16, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Trustee Following Conversion (Text Order)]
  • May 16, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Trustee's Final Report Following Conversion]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Change of Address (Debtor Only) (Text Entry)]
  • April 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Change of Address (Debtor Only) (Text Entry)]
  • April 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Support Document]
  • April 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
  • April 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • April 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • April 23, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 23, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • April 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • April 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Intention]
  • April 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Intention]
  • April 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation Form 122A-2]
  • April 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation Form 122A-2]
  • April 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Voluntary Conversion by Debtor(s) to Chapter 7 (fee required)]
  • April 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Voluntary Conversion by Debtor(s) to Chapter 7 (fee required)]
  • April 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • March 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
  • March 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • March 03, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • January 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • January 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • January 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (deactivated)]
  • January 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • January 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • January 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • January 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • January 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • January 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.