U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-04002
  • Case Name: Pierce v. Lindberg
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Receipt of Filing Fee]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 21, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Request for Certified Copy]
  • March 20, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Close Adversary Case]
  • March 05, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 03, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Judgment]
  • March 03, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Nonstandard Order]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Return of Service ]
  • January 12, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Summons Service Executed]
  • January 12, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Summons Issued]
  • January 12, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Fees - Deferred]
  • January 12, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.