U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10006
  • Case Name: David James Landers
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 20, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 18, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 17, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
October, 2020
  • October 31, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Intention]
  • September 16, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Trustee Following Conversion (Text Order)]
  • September 16, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Trustee's Final Report Following Conversion]
  • September 15, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • September 15, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • September 15, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • September 15, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • September 10, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Schedule of Disclosures After Conversion]
  • September 10, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedule of Disclosures After Conversion]
  • September 10, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Supplement Schedule I and/or J]
  • September 10, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Supplement Schedule I and/or J]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • August 31, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • August 31, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 31, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 19, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 19, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 17, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • August 17, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • August 17, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • August 17, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • August 17, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • August 17, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • August 17, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 17, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 17, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Voluntary Conversion by Debtor(s) to Chapter 7 (fee required)]
  • August 17, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Voluntary Conversion by Debtor(s) to Chapter 7 (fee required)]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2019
  • July 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
June, 2017
  • June 02, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • May 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
April, 2017
  • April 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 05, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 05, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • April 05, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • April 04, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • April 04, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor Repayment Plan]
  • March 29, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedule J]
  • March 29, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • March 27, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedule J]
  • March 23, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • March 22, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • March 22, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • March 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
January, 2017
  • January 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 26, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 26, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Late Notice]
  • January 26, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • January 26, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • January 23, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • January 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (deactivated)]
  • January 15, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • January 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • January 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • January 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • January 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.