U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cv-05003
  • Case Name: Lietzke v. City of Montgomery et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Receipt]
  • June 06, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • May 18, 2017: [Default Judgment]
  • May 01, 2017: [Letter Sent]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Response]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Order to Show Cause]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • January 18, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • January 18, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 18, 2017: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.