U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 12-40008
  • Case Name: Daniel William Bilben and Heidi Catherine Bilben
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 16, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Closing Case]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
February, 2017
  • February 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • February 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • January 30, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge (Ch 11/13)]
  • January 21, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.