U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-04006
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Ringling et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: [Judgment]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Proposed Order]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Objection]
  • July 19, 2018: [Reply]
  • July 06, 2018: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • July 05, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 05, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 05, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • June 25, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 21, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 20, 2018: [Extend]
  • June 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 19, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 19, 2018: [Extend]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • May 31, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 31, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: [Notice]
  • January 04, 2018: [Certificate]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Notice]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 29, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 14, 2017: [Certificate]
  • November 14, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • August 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 17, 2017: [Discovery Report]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [Reply]
  • June 02, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 02, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 12, 2017: [Leave to]
  • May 12, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • May 12, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 12, 2017: [Strike]
  • May 09, 2017: [Letter Received]
  • May 04, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • April 24, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 24, 2017: [Entry of Default]
  • April 24, 2017: [Application]
  • April 21, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 23, 2017: [Certificate]
  • March 23, 2017: [Extend]
  • March 23, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 22, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 07, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 14, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • January 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 23, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 23, 2017: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 23, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.