U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cv-05007
  • Case Name: Walker v. Yants et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Letter Received]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Miscellaneous Submission (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • September 13, 2017: [USCA Order]
July, 2017
  • July 10, 2017: [USCA Judgment]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [USCA Order]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • April 26, 2017: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • April 26, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • April 19, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • April 19, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 14, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 13, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • April 13, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 09, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • January 24, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 24, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • January 24, 2017: [Preliminary Injunction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.