U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramos
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Exhibits]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 01, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Allocution Statement]
  • June 25, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • June 14, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 12, 2019: [Furlough]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 13, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 09, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 09, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 09, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 09, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 09, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 09, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
  • March 05, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 04, 2019: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 26, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 07, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 07, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 07, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 07, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 06, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 11, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 11, 2018: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 11, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 05, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 05, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 05, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 20, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 11, 2018: [Order]
  • May 11, 2018: [Amended Plea Agreement]
  • May 11, 2018: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 11, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 11, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 09, 2018: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • May 04, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 04, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 04, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 04, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 27, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 27, 2018: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 14, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 09, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 05, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 20, 2018: [Extend]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 14, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 09, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 26, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 21, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 21, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 13, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 19, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 19, 2017: [Transcript]
  • May 02, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • May 02, 2017: [Evidentiary Hearing]
April, 2017
  • April 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2017: [Redacted Document]
  • April 03, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 03, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 22, 2017: [Extend]
  • March 17, 2017: [Redacted Document]
  • March 17, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • March 17, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 17, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 17, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 13, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 13, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 10, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 10, 2017: [Release from Custody]
  • March 07, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 07, 2017: [Suppress]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Request]
  • February 13, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 13, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 13, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 13, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 13, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 13, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • February 13, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 13, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • February 13, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 13, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 10, 2017: [Arrest]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Indictment]
  • January 24, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 24, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.