U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garduno-Esquival
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 20, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 20, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • July 11, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 11, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 11, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 12, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 24, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 24, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • May 24, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 19, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 14, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 14, 2017: [Consent]
  • April 14, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 17, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 17, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 17, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • February 01, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Request]
  • January 31, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 25, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 25, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • January 25, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 25, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 25, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 25, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • January 25, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 25, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • January 25, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 25, 2017: [Interpreter Needed]
  • January 25, 2017: [Arrest]
  • January 24, 2017: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 24, 2017: [Indictment]
  • January 24, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 24, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.