U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bald Eagle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Mail Returned]
  • January 23, 2023: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • January 20, 2023: [Response]
  • January 17, 2023: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • January 05, 2023: [Transcript]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error - Court Reporter]
  • December 21, 2022: [Transcript]
  • December 21, 2022: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • December 20, 2022: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 15, 2022: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 12, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 09, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 06, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 01, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 30, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 30, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 30, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 30, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 11, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 09, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 02, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Competency Evaluation]
  • May 17, 2021: [Competency Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Furlough]
  • March 30, 2021: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 29, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Furlough]
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 29, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 29, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 29, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 29, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 12, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 05, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Finding of Probable Cause]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 20, 2019: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 20, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 13, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 09, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 09, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 09, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 09, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 09, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 09, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 08, 2019: [Order on Ex Parte Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 03, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • September 21, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 21, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 21, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 14, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • July 18, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 18, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • July 18, 2017: [Furlough]
  • July 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • July 07, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 07, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • July 07, 2017: [Furlough]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 09, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 09, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 09, 2017: [Waiver]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 28, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 28, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2017
  • March 13, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 13, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Request]
  • January 30, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 25, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 25, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • January 25, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 25, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • January 25, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 25, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 25, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 25, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 25, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • January 25, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 25, 2017: [Arrest]
  • January 24, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 24, 2017: [Indictment]
  • January 24, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.