U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 10, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 04, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 04, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 04, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 04, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 04, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 04, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 21, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 21, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 26, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 26, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 26, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 26, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 26, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 16, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 18, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 06, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 18, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 18, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 18, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 18, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 18, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 17, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 24, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 22, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • January 16, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 16, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 16, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 12, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • January 12, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 20, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 28, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 28, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 28, 2017: [Consent]
  • July 28, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2017
  • June 23, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 02, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 02, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 02, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 17, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • May 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • May 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • May 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 08, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 08, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 08, 2017: [Withdraw Document]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 05, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 05, 2017: [Response to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 28, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 28, 2017: [Suppress]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 03, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 07, 2017: [Request]
  • February 07, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 06, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 06, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 06, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 06, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 06, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 06, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • February 06, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 06, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • February 06, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 06, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • February 03, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 02, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 01, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 24, 2017: [Indictment]
  • January 24, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.