U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cr-10023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bobtail Bear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 11, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 06, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 06, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 07, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 17, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 17, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 16, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 16, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 16, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 16, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 16, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 13, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 13, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 13, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
August, 2019
  • August 06, 2019: [Ex Parte Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 08, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 08, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 06, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 06, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 02, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 02, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 02, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 02, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 02, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 02, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 02, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 01, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 01, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
May, 2017
  • May 08, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 04, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 04, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 18, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 10, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 06, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 04, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 15, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 15, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 10, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 10, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 10, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • March 10, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 10, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 10, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 10, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 09, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.