U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Big Boy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • November 02, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order re Exhibits]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 18, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 16, 2019: [Sentencing]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 15, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 15, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 15, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 20, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 20, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 13, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 13, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 13, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 10, 2019: [Order]
  • May 10, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • May 08, 2019: [Stipulation]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Order]
  • March 25, 2019: [Psychiatric Report Received]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 20, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 15, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 13, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 13, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 12, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 14, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 14, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Order]
  • August 31, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 24, 2018: [Notice]
  • August 14, 2018: [Notice]
  • August 09, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • August 09, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 31, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 27, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 27, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 27, 2018: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 13, 2018: [Psychiatric Report Received]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • June 18, 2018: [Notice]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Order]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order]
  • December 20, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • December 18, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 15, 2017: [Stipulation]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Competency Report]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Competency Evaluation]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 04, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2017: [Competency Evaluation]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 23, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 26, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 17, 2017: [Request]
  • April 17, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 14, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 14, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 14, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • April 14, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 14, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 14, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • April 13, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 13, 2017: [Arrest]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 24, 2017: [Indictment]
  • January 24, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.