U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. High Hawk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 05, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 07, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • March 07, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 07, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 07, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 07, 2017: [Request]
  • March 07, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 06, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 06, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 06, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 06, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 06, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 06, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 06, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 06, 2017: [Arrest]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Indictment]
  • January 24, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 24, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.