U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pumpkin Seed
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 30, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 30, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • July 22, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 22, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 22, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 09, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 06, 2021: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • July 02, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 01, 2021: [Extend]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 30, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 30, 2021: [Consent]
  • April 30, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 27, 2021: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 12, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 12, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 12, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 02, 2021: [Brief]
  • April 02, 2021: [In Limine]
  • April 01, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 03, 2020: [Sealed Order]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Waiver]
  • August 04, 2020: [Stipulation]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Psychiatric Report Received]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Sealed Order]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 21, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 07, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 07, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 27, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 27, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 27, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 26, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 14, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • June 28, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 20, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 25, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 24, 2019: [Notice]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 18, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 20, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 15, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • February 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 13, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • December 13, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 07, 2018: [Furlough]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 28, 2018: [Transcript]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • July 02, 2018: [Extend]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • May 09, 2018: [Evidentiary Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Continue]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 22, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 17, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 12, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 12, 2018: [Suppress]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 15, 2017: [Continue]
  • December 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 06, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 06, 2017: [Leave to]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • November 30, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 27, 2017: [Extend]
  • November 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 24, 2017: [Extend]
  • November 20, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 20, 2017: [Suppress]
  • November 17, 2017: [Suppress]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 03, 2017: [Continue]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 01, 2017: [Continue]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 16, 2017: [Consent]
  • June 13, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 24, 2017: [Order]
  • May 24, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • May 19, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 11, 2017: [Stipulation]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Competency Report]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 07, 2017: [Furlough]
March, 2017
  • March 03, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Competency Evaluation]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 01, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 01, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 01, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 01, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • February 01, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • February 01, 2017: [Competency Evaluation]
  • February 01, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 30, 2017: [Arrest]
  • January 24, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 24, 2017: [Indictment]
  • January 24, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.