U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tail
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 30, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 30, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • November 20, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 20, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 20, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 17, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • November 13, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 13, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 01, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 01, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 26, 2017: [Consent]
  • May 26, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 08, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 08, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 08, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 13, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 03, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 08, 2017: [Request]
  • February 08, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 06, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 06, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 06, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 06, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 06, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 06, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • February 06, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • February 06, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 03, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 02, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 24, 2017: [Indictment]
  • January 24, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.