U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Old Horse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Furlough]
  • August 03, 2022: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 03, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 03, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 27, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 24, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 24, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 24, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 24, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 04, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 22, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 08, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • November 10, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 09, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 09, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 06, 2020: [Consent]
  • November 06, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 09, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 06, 2018: [Sentencing]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 27, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 27, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 13, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • February 13, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 01, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 06, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 06, 2017: [Consent]
  • November 06, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 27, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 27, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 27, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 19, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 12, 2017: [1 - Ex Parte Document]
  • October 12, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 11, 2017: [1 - Ex Parte Document]
  • October 11, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • August 25, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • August 04, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 04, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • August 04, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 26, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 11, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 04, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 14, 2017: [Request]
  • March 14, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 13, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 10, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 10, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 10, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 10, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 10, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 10, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 10, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 10, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 10, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 09, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 09, 2017: [Arrest]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 24, 2017: [Indictment]
  • January 24, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.