U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 13-10060
  • Case Name: Joseph Paul Larson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request for Certified Copy]
  • October 09, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 09, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request for Certified Copy]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 10, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Closing Case]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
  • August 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 08, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
July, 2017
  • July 15, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • July 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge (Ch 11/13)]
  • July 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 08, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Change of Address (Debtor Only) (Text Entry)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.