U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-03001
  • Case Name: Roggenbuck, II et al v. Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Exhibits Destroyed]
  • November 05, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
  • November 05, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • July 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Nonstandard Order]
  • July 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Decision]
May, 2018
  • May 04, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Court's Exhibit and Witness List]
  • April 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • April 13, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
  • April 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Exhibit and/or Witness List]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Set Deadlines/Hearing]
  • January 25, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 03, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Transcript (Depositions and 2004 Exams Only)]
  • December 27, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Transcript]
  • December 19, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Transcript (Depositions and 2004 Exams Only)]
  • December 05, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Set Deadlines/Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Reply]
  • October 12, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Objection]
  • October 12, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Statement Material Facts]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Transcript (Depositions and 2004 Exams Only)]
  • August 29, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • August 29, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • August 29, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Set Deadlines/Hearing]
  • August 28, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
  • August 28, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Support Document]
  • August 28, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 28, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Transcript (Depositions and 2004 Exams Only)]
June, 2017
  • June 09, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Subpoena]
  • June 09, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • June 08, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • June 08, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • June 08, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Set Deadlines/Hearing]
  • June 08, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Examination (2004)]
  • June 08, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response to Request for Admissions/Production of Documents]
April, 2017
  • April 05, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Request for Production of Documents]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • March 01, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling Order (pre-trial/trial)]
  • March 01, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 26, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • January 25, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • January 25, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.