U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Crain
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • December 10, 2018: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • January 29, 2018: [Order]
  • January 24, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 24, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 24, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 22, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 22, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • January 16, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 16, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 16, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 12, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • January 12, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 20, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 28, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 28, 2017: [Consent]
  • July 28, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 28, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 26, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • July 13, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 13, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 13, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 13, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 13, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 08, 2017: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • May 08, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 08, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 05, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 03, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 08, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 27, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 27, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • January 27, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 27, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 26, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 26, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • January 25, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 25, 2017: [Arrest]
  • January 25, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.